AL HB92 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Forwarded to Governor on April 5, 2022 at 5:14 p.m. on April 5, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-04-05 - Forwarded to Governor on April 5, 2022 at 5:14 p.m. on April 5, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Secretary of State, Legislature, bills and resolutions, authorized to provide digital copies only, Sec. 36-14-1 am'd.
Title
Secretary of State, Legislature, bills and resolutions, authorized to provide digital copies only, Sec. 36-14-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-04-05 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 931 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - SBIR: Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt Roll Call 930 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 154 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - HBIR: Bracy motion to Adopt Roll Call 153 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-04-05 - Senate - SBIR: Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt Roll Call 930 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 154 (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-15 - House - HBIR: Bracy motion to Adopt Roll Call 153 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 5, 2022 at 5:14 p.m. on April 5, 2022. |
2022-04-05 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-343. |
2022-04-05 | House | Enrolled |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-04-05 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-04-05 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 931 |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2022-02-15 | House | Robbins intended to vote "Yea" |
2022-02-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 154 |
2022-02-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB267 (Same As) 2022-03-01 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs