AL HB91 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-20 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to the City of Columbiana in Shelby County; to authorize the City Council of the City of Columbiana to establish and regulate the operation of entertainment districts in the city as designated by the Columbiana City Code; and to authorize the city council to provide penalties for violations.
Title
Relating to the City of Columbiana in Shelby County; to authorize the City Council of the City of Columbiana to establish and regulate the operation of entertainment districts in the city as designated by the Columbiana City Code; and to authorize the city council to provide penalties for violations.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 75 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - House - Adopt JIS8FF-1 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 69 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 12 N: 0 NV: 75 Abs: 18) [FAIL]
2023-04-04 - House - Adopt JIS8FF-1 (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 69 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-20 | House | Enacted |
2023-04-20 | House | Enrolled |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-20 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate Shelby County Legislation |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate Shelby County Legislation |
2023-04-04 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-04 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-04 | House | Adopt JIS8FF-1 |
2023-04-04 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Favorably from House Shelby County Legislation |
2023-03-21 | House | Amendment/Substitute by House Shelby County Legislation VO1QVP-1 |
2023-03-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Shelby County Legislation |
2023-03-07 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |