AL HB91 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Forwarded to Governor at 4:30 p.m. on March 16, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 16 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-16 - Forwarded to Governor at 4:30 p.m. on March 16, 2021.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Class 5 municipality, mayor/commission/city manager form of government, abatement of grass or weeds, notice and assessment of cost provided to property owners, liens on property under certain conditions
Title
Class 5 municipality, mayor/commission/city manager form of government, abatement of grass or weeds, notice and assessment of cost provided to property owners, liens on property under certain conditions
Sponsors
Rep. Paul Lee [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-16 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 570 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SBIR: Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 569 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 141 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 65 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - HBIR: Lee motion to Adopt Roll Call 140 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 48 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2021-03-16 - Senate - SBIR: Chesteen motion to Adopt Roll Call 569 (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 141 (Y: 23 N: 1 NV: 65 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2021-02-24 - House - HBIR: Lee motion to Adopt Roll Call 140 (Y: 42 N: 1 NV: 48 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-16 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 4:30 p.m. on March 16, 2021. |
2021-03-16 | House | Assigned Act No. 2021-138. |
2021-03-16 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2021-03-16 | House | Enrolled |
2021-03-16 | House | Passed Second House |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 570 |
2021-03-16 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2021-03-11 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2021-02-24 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 141 |
2021-02-24 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-23 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |