AL HB91 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-01-25 - Pending third reading on day 7 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security with 1 substitute
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Motor vehicles, distinctive license plates, Helping Schools, fee increased, Sec. 32-6-300 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Motor vehicles, distinctive license plates, Helping Schools, fee increased, Sec. 32-6-300 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-02-13 - House - Collins motion to Local Application (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 51 Abs: 13) [FAIL]
2018-02-13 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 28 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Senate - Orr motion to Adopt (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-01-25HousePending third reading on day 7 Favorable from Public Safety and Homeland Security with 1 substitute
2018-01-25HousePublic Safety and Homeland Security first Substitute Offered
2018-01-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB91&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB91-int.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190306-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=585266&VOTE=238&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=585267&VOTE=239&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=587488&VOTE=293&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=587491&VOTE=294&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback