AL HB91 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Education, code red alert, emergency drills to collectively include safety, security, severe weather, fire, and code red drills, time frame for conducting drills, Secs. 16-1-44, 36-19-10 am'd.
Title
Education, code red alert, emergency drills to collectively include safety, security, severe weather, fire, and code red drills, time frame for conducting drills, Secs. 16-1-44, 36-19-10 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2013-05-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 27) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-18 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 17) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:20 p.m. on May 20, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-329. |
2013-05-20 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-05-20 | House | Enrolled |
2013-05-20 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1099 |
2013-05-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-04-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education |
2013-04-18 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-18 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2013-04-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 602 |
2013-04-18 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 601 |
2013-04-18 | House | Education Policy Amendment Offered |
2013-04-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2013-02-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |