AL HB90 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Brown (K) motion to withdraw his motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-07 - Brown (K) motion to withdraw his motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Motor vehicles, distracted driving, use of cell phone while operating a motor vehicle prohibited, exceptions, Secs. 32-5A-353 to 32-5A-358, inclusive, added; Sec. 32-5A-350 repealed; Secs. 32-5A-351, 32-5A-352, am'd and renumbered, 32-10-8 am'd.
Title
Motor vehicles, distracted driving, use of cell phone while operating a motor vehicle prohibited, exceptions, Secs. 32-5A-353 to 32-5A-358, inclusive, added; Sec. 32-5A-350 repealed; Secs. 32-5A-351, 32-5A-352, am'd and renumbered, 32-10-8 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. K.L. Brown [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-04-07 - House - Pringle motion to Suspend Rules Roll Call 702 (Y: 46 N: 2 NV: 9 Abs: 46) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 660 (Y: 47 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - House - Brown (K) motion to Table Roll Call 659 (Y: 61 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 658 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 657 (Y: 71 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: Brown (K) motion to Adopt Roll Call 219 (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 660 (Y: 47 N: 48 NV: 4 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
2021-04-06 - House - Brown (K) motion to Table Roll Call 659 (Y: 61 N: 28 NV: 3 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 658 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-04-06 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 657 (Y: 71 N: 15 NV: 8 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-02-25 - House - HBIR: Brown (K) motion to Adopt Roll Call 219 (Y: 65 N: 28 NV: 6 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-07 | House | Brown (K) motion to withdraw his motion to reconsider adopted Voice Vote |
2021-04-07 | House | Brown (K) motion to Reconsider offered |
2021-04-06 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass lost Roll Call 660 |
2021-04-06 | House | Brown (K) motion to Table adopted Roll Call 659 |
2021-04-06 | House | Kiel Amendment Offered |
2021-04-06 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 658 |
2021-04-06 | House | Jones (M) Amendment Offered |
2021-04-06 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 657 |
2021-04-06 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered |
2021-04-06 | House | Lost in house of origin |
2021-02-25 | House | Brown (K) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote |
2021-02-25 | House | Public Safety and Homeland Security Amendment Offered |
2021-02-25 | House | Third Reading Carried Over |
2021-02-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
32 | 10 | 8 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 5A | 350 | Repealed Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 5A | 351 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 5A | 352 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 5A | 353 | New Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 5A | 354 | New Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 5A | 355 | New Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 5A | 356 | New Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 5A | 357 | New Code | See Bill Text |
32 | 5A | 358 | New Code | See Bill Text |