AL HB90 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Assigned Act No. 2018-126.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-02-15 - Assigned Act No. 2018-126.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Residential property, foreclosure, right-of-redemption, time period to redeem further provided for, notice requirement actions, affirmative defense, provided for, time frame for notice requirement actions, further provided for, Sec. 6-5-248 am'd.
Title
Residential property, foreclosure, right-of-redemption, time period to redeem further provided for, notice requirement actions, affirmative defense, provided for, time frame for notice requirement actions, further provided for, Sec. 6-5-248 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Kerry Rich [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-02-13 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-01-18 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-15 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-126. |
2018-02-15 | House | Delivered to Governor at 10:08 a.m. on February 15, 2018. |
2018-02-15 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-02-13 | House | Enrolled |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-02-13 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 393 |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-18 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance |
2018-01-18 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 50 |
2018-01-18 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |