AL HB9 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on January 30 2018 - 50% progression
Action: 2018-02-01 - Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Youth sports, unpaid and volunteer youth athletics assoc. personnel to complete a youth injury mitigation course annually

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Youth sports, unpaid and volunteer youth athletics assoc. personnel to complete a youth injury mitigation course annually

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-01-30 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 41 N: 21 NV: 2 Abs: 38) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 17) [PASS]
2018-01-30 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 82 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 17) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-01SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Health and Human Services
2018-01-30HouseEngrossed
2018-01-30HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 141
2018-01-30HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 140
2018-01-30HouseWilliams (JD) Amendment Offered
2018-01-30HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 139
2018-01-30HouseEducation Policy Amendment resumed
2018-01-30HouseFurther Consideration
2018-01-30HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-30HouseWilliams (JD) motion to Carry Over Temporarily adopted Voice Vote
2018-01-30HouseEducation Policy Amendment Offered
2018-01-30HouseThird Reading Carried Over
2018-01-25HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback