AL HB89 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 4:19 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 4:19 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
School safety, Education Dept. required to develop and implement electronic notification system for input of emergency information
Title
School safety, Education Dept. required to develop and implement electronic notification system for input of emergency information
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 90 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2017-02-23 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 93 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:19 p.m. on May 19, 2017. |
2017-05-19 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-401. |
2017-05-19 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-05-19 | House | Enrolled |
2017-05-19 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1297 |
2017-05-19 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |
2017-02-23 | House | Engrossed |
2017-02-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 84 |
2017-02-23 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 83 |
2017-02-23 | House | Education Policy first Substitute Offered |
2017-02-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |