AL HB89 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:40 p. m. on May 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:40 p. m. on May 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
E-911 services, statewide board established to replace Commercial Radio Service Board, service charge, collect and deposited into E-911 fund and distribute to local E-911 district to implement enhanced E-911, procedures and requirements provided, Secs. 11-98-1, 11-98-2, 11-98-4, 11-98-5, 11-98-6, 11-98-7, 11-98-9 am'd; Secs. 11-98-4.1, 11-98-5.2, 11-98-5.3, 11-98-13, 11-98-13.1, 11-98-14, 11-98-15 added; Secs. 11-98-5.1, 11-98-7.1, 11-98-8 repealed (2012-20150)
Title
E-911 services, statewide board established to replace Commercial Radio Service Board, service charge, collect and deposited into E-911 fund and distribute to local E-911 district to implement enhanced E-911, procedures and requirements provided, Secs. 11-98-1, 11-98-2, 11-98-4, 11-98-5, 11-98-6, 11-98-7, 11-98-9 am'd; Secs. 11-98-4.1, 11-98-5.2, 11-98-5.3, 11-98-13, 11-98-13.1, 11-98-14, 11-98-15 added; Secs. 11-98-5.1, 11-98-7.1, 11-98-8 repealed (2012-20150)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - Millican motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 71 N: 12 NV: 6 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-27 - Senate - Marsh motion to Adopt (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 77 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 84 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 16) [PASS]
2012-04-03 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 86 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Forwarded to Governor at 3:40 p. m. on May 1, 2012. | |
2012-05-01 | Assigned Act No. 2012-293. | |
2012-05-01 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-01 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-01 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-01 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-05-01 | Millican motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1070 | |
2012-05-01 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 822 | |
2012-04-26 | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 821 | |
2012-04-26 | Governmental Affairs Amendment No. 2 Offered. | |
2012-04-26 | Marsh motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 820 | |
2012-04-26 | Governmental Affairs Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-17 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments | |
2012-04-05 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2012-04-03 | Engrossed | |
2012-04-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 560 | |
2012-04-03 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 559 | |
2012-04-03 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 558 | |
2012-04-03 | Boards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-03 | Boards, Agencies and Commissions first Substitute Offered | |
2012-04-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-01 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and 1 amendment | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |