AL HB87 | 2022 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-03-01 - Delivered to Governor at 3:00 p.m. on March 1, 2022.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Gardendale school tax district of Jefferson County Board of Education, renewal of ad valorem tax, referendum

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Gardendale school tax district of Jefferson County Board of Education, renewal of ad valorem tax, referendum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2022-02-24 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 420 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-24 - Senate - SBIR: Smitherman motion to Adopt Roll Call 419 (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2022-02-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 114 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 60 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
2022-02-10 - House - HBIR: Treadaway motion to Adopt Roll Call 113 (Y: 54 N: 0 NV: 46 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2022-03-01HouseDelivered to Governor at 3:00 p.m. on March 1, 2022.
2022-03-01HouseAssigned Act No. 2022-82.
2022-03-01HouseClerk of the House Certification
2022-03-01SenateSignature Requested
2022-02-24HouseEnrolled
2022-02-24HousePassed Second House
2022-02-24SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 420
2022-02-24SenateThird Reading Passed
2022-02-23SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2022-02-10SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Jefferson County Legislation
2022-02-10HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 114
2022-02-10HouseThird Reading Passed
2022-02-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2022-01-11HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Jefferson County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB87&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/HB87-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2022RS/PrintFiles/HB87-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=673983&VOTE=113&BODY=H&INST=HBIR%20for%20HB87&SESS=1079
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=673998&VOTE=114&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=677817&VOTE=419&BODY=S&INST=SBIR%20for%20HB87&SESS=1079
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=677820&VOTE=420&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1079&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback