AL HB87 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Forwarded to Governor on April 27, 2017 at 2:10 p.m. on April 27, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 27 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-27 - Forwarded to Governor on April 27, 2017 at 2:10 p.m. on April 27, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revenue Dept., tax returns, tax refund fraud, provisions to combat identity theft, standardizing tax returns and license applications, authorized, penalties for checks or electronic funds not paid, Secs. 40-29-130, 40-30-7 added; Sec. 40-18-79, 40-29-70 am'd.
Title
Revenue Dept., tax returns, tax refund fraud, provisions to combat identity theft, standardizing tax returns and license applications, authorized, penalties for checks or electronic funds not paid, Secs. 40-29-130, 40-30-7 added; Sec. 40-18-79, 40-29-70 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 20 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-27 | House | Forwarded to Governor on April 27, 2017 at 2:10 p.m. on April 27, 2017. |
2017-04-27 | House | Assigned Act No. 2017-227. |
2017-04-27 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2017-04-27 | House | Enrolled |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed Second House |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 740 |
2017-04-27 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-03-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2017-03-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 117 |
2017-03-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2017-02-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2017-02-07 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |