AL HB87 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Assigned Act No. 2016-295.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-03 - Assigned Act No. 2016-295.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipalities, commission form of gov't under Chapter 44, Title 11, special election procedures, repealed, savings provisions Chapter 44, Title 11 and Article 3, Chapter 46, Title 11 repealed, Secs. 11-44-1 to 11-44-162, inclusive, Secs. 11-46-90 to 11-46-145 inclusive, repealed
Title
Municipalities, commission form of gov't under Chapter 44, Title 11, special election procedures, repealed, savings provisions Chapter 44, Title 11 and Article 3, Chapter 46, Title 11 repealed, Secs. 11-44-1 to 11-44-162, inclusive, Secs. 11-46-90 to 11-46-145 inclusive, repealed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-04-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2016-03-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 103 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-03 | House | Assigned Act No. 2016-295. |
2016-05-03 | House | Delivered to Governor at 1:24 p.m. on May 3, 2016. |
2016-05-03 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2016-05-03 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2016-04-28 | House | Enrolled |
2016-04-28 | House | Passed Second House |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 887 |
2016-04-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2016-04-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government |
2016-03-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 392 |
2016-03-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2016-02-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2016-02-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |