AL HB87 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 24 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-05-07 - Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal Procedure, criminal surveillance, judge authorized to issue warrant for installation, removal, maintenance, use, and monitoring of tracking device upon written application of law enforcement officer or district attorney
Title
Criminal Procedure, criminal surveillance, judge authorized to issue warrant for installation, removal, maintenance, use, and monitoring of tracking device upon written application of law enforcement officer or district attorney
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-07 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to table Ross motion to recommit (Y: 20 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-05-02 - Senate - Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer (Y: 17 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 97 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-07 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 29 Favorable from Judiciary |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to table Ross motion to recommit adopted Roll Call 841 |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Ross motion to recommit |
2013-05-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Bussman motion to table Smitherman motion to rerefer adopted Roll Call 694 |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Smitherman motion to rerefer |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2013-04-24 | House | Engrossed |
2013-04-24 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 769 |
2013-04-24 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 768 |
2013-04-24 | House | Judiciary first Substitute Offered |
2013-04-24 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-28 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and |
2013-02-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |