AL HB86 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Delivered to Governor at 4:32 p.m. on March 8, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 8 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-08 - Delivered to Governor at 4:32 p.m. on March 8, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Municipalities, any municipality that was abolished by a law shall function as a municipality from the date of its initial organization
Title
Municipalities, any municipality that was abolished by a law shall function as a municipality from the date of its initial organization
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 83 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 15) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-08 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:32 p.m. on March 8, 2018. |
2018-03-08 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-247. |
2018-03-08 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-08 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 729 |
2018-03-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-02-20 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government |
2018-02-15 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 358 |
2018-02-15 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-25 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on County and Municipal Government |