AL HB84 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:40 a.m. on March 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-20 - Delivered to Governor at 9:40 a.m. on March 14, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Schools, Accountability Act of 2013, State Board of Education and local boards, procedures for exemption of public schools from state rules, tax credits for families with students in failing schools to attend another public or private school and for scholarship donations
Title
Schools, Accountability Act of 2013, State Board of Education and local boards, procedures for exemption of public schools from state rules, tax credits for families with students in failing schools to attend another public or private school and for scholarship donations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-01 - Senate - Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - Fincher motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - Fincher motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Adopt Holtzclaw Amendment (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Motion to Adopt Fincher Amendment (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Johnson (W) motion to Previous Question (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Holmes motion to Adjourn (Y: 19 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-03-01 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - Fincher motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 51 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 26) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Marsh motion to Accede (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - House - Fincher motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 61 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 7 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Motion to Adopt Holtzclaw Amendment (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-28 - Senate - Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate (Y: 22 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 31 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Motion to Adopt Fincher Amendment (Y: 63 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 65 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Johnson (W) motion to Previous Question (Y: 64 N: 33 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Holmes motion to Adjourn (Y: 19 N: 69 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [FAIL]
2013-02-14 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 63 N: 35 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-02-14 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 62 N: 33 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 64 N: 30 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2013-02-13 - House - Fincher motion to Table (Y: 68 N: 28 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-20 | House | Delivered to Governor at 9:40 a.m. on March 14, 2013. |
2013-05-20 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-64. |
2013-05-20 | House | Greeson inadvertently voted "Abstain" and intended to vote "Nay" on the motion offered by Representative Fincher on the ninth legislative day that the House nonconcur in the Senate amendment to the bill, HB84, and request the Speaker appoin |
2013-05-20 | House | Greeson inadvertently voted "Abstain" and intended to vote "Nay" on the motion offered by Representative Fincher that the House to concur in and adopt the Report of the Committee on Conference on the disagreement of the two Houses on the Se |
2013-03-14 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-03-14 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-03-14 | House | Enrolled |
2013-03-14 | House | Concurred in Conference Report |
2013-03-05 | House | Rogers dissent filed |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Marsh motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 189 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 188 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Returned to Senate for Consideration. |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Conference Report Concurrence Requested |
2013-02-28 | House | Fincher motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 182 |
2013-02-28 | House | Conference Committee on HB84 2013RS first Substitute Offered |
2013-02-28 | House | Conference Report |
2013-02-28 | House | Conference Committee Appointed |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Marsh motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 176 Senate appoints Marsh, Ross and Dial |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Conference Committee Requested |
2013-02-28 | House | Fincher motion to Nonconcur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 174 House appoints Fincher, Love and Hall |
2013-02-28 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 175 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Motion to Adopt Holtzclaw Amendment adopted Roll Call 174 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Rules Committee Petition to Cease Debate adopted Roll Call 173 |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Holtzclaw Amendment Offered |
2013-02-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-21 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education |
2013-02-14 | House | Engrossed |
2013-02-14 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 39 |
2013-02-14 | House | Givan intended to vote "Nay" |
2013-02-14 | House | Motion to Adopt Fincher Amendment adopted Roll Call 38 |
2013-02-14 | House | Johnson (W) motion to Previous Question adopted Roll Call 37 |
2013-02-14 | House | Holmes motion to Adjourn lost Roll Call 36 |
2013-02-14 | House | Fincher motion to Table Rogers Substitute Amendment adopted Roll Call 35 |
2013-02-14 | House | Rogers Substitute Amendment Offered |
2013-02-14 | House | Fincher motion to Table Coleman-Evans Substitute Amendment adopted Roll Call 34 |
2013-02-14 | House | Coleman-Evans Substitute Amendment Offered |
2013-02-14 | House | Fincher motion to Table Boyd Substitute Amendment adopted Roll Call 33 |
2013-02-14 | House | Boyd Substitute Amendment Offered |
2013-02-14 | House | Fincher motion to Table Moore (M) Substitute adopted Roll Call 32 |
2013-02-14 | House | Moore (M) Substitute Amendment Offered |
2013-02-14 | House | Fincher motion to Table Ford Substitute Amendment adopted Roll Call 31 |
2013-02-14 | House | Ford Substitute Amendment Offered |
2013-02-14 | House | Fincher motion to Table Black Substitute Amendment adopted Roll Call 30 |
2013-02-14 | House | Black Substitute Amendment Offered |
2013-02-14 | House | Fincher Amendment Offered |
2013-02-14 | House | Fincher motion to Table adopted Roll Call 29 |
2013-02-14 | House | Education Policy Amendment #2 Offered |
2013-02-14 | House | Fincher motion to Table adopted Roll Call 28 |
2013-02-14 | House | Education Policy Amendment #1 Offered |
2013-02-14 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 2 amendments |
2013-02-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |