AL HB83 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-04-11 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Local boards of education; maximum compensation of board members, increased; continuing education requirements as condition for compensation, required
Title
Local boards of education; maximum compensation of board members, increased; continuing education requirements as condition for compensation, required
Sponsors
Rep. Tracy Estes [R] |
Roll Calls
2024-04-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Roll Call 433 (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-04-04 - House - Third Reading in House of Origin (Y: 102 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-11 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-04-10 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Pending Senate Education Policy |
2024-04-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Education Policy |
2024-04-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 433 |
2024-04-04 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-03-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | House | Pending House Education Policy |
2024-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Education Policy |
2024-02-01 | House | Prefiled |