AL HB83 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 29 2022 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-05 - Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Governmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Education, Prepaid Affordable College Tuition Program board, may meet electronically, Sec. 16-33C-4.1 am'd.
Title
Education, Prepaid Affordable College Tuition Program board, may meet electronically, Sec. 16-33C-4.1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-03-29 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 739 (Y: 100 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - HBIR: Garrett motion to Adopt Roll Call 738 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-03-29 - House - HBIR: Garrett motion to Adopt Roll Call 738 (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-05 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 28 Favorable from Governmental Affairs |
2022-04-05 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-03-29 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs |
2022-03-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 739 |
2022-03-29 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-09 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |
Same As/Similar To
SB84 (Same As) 2022-03-30 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from State Government