AL HB83 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Conference Report
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Veterans, unemployed, tax credit created for hiring of, regardless of whether veteran was recently deployed, Sec. 40-18-320.1 added; Secs. 40-18-320, 40-18-321, 40-18-322, 40-18-324 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Veterans, unemployed, tax credit created for hiring of, regardless of whether veteran was recently deployed, Sec. 40-18-320.1 added; Secs. 40-18-320, 40-18-321, 40-18-322, 40-18-324 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-06 - Senate - Williams motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-03-01 - House - Rowe motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-22 - Senate - Motion to Accede (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-02-20 - House - Rowe motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee (Y: 88 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Senate - Williams motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-06HouseConference Report
2018-03-06HouseConference Committee on HB83 2018RS first Substitute Offered
2018-03-06HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-194.
2018-03-06HouseDelivered to Governor at 4:52 p.m. on March 6, 2018.
2018-03-06HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-06HouseEnrolled
2018-03-06HouseConcurred in Conference Report
2018-03-06SenateWilliams motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 595
2018-03-06SenateConference Report Concurrence Requested
2018-03-01HouseRowe motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 576
2018-03-01HouseConference Report
2018-02-22HouseConference Committee Appointed
2018-02-22SenateDial motion to Accede adopted Roll Call 451 P&PO appoints Williams, Dial and Beasley
2018-02-22SenateConference Committee Requested
2018-02-20HouseRowe motion to Non Concur and Appoint Conference Committee adopted Roll Call 380 House appoints Rowe, Poole and Todd
2018-02-20HouseConcurrence Requested
2018-02-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 412
2018-02-15SenateWilliams motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 411
2018-02-15SenateWilliams Amendment Offered
2018-02-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-01-25SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-16SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Veterans and Military Affairs
2018-01-16HouseEngrossed
2018-01-16HouseMembers intended to Cosponsor
2018-01-16HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 22
2018-01-16HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 21
2018-01-16HouseGrimsley Amendment Offered
2018-01-16HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-11HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Military and Veterans Affairs

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB83&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB83-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB83-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB83-enr.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/189955-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190564-1.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192088-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=581128&VOTE=21&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=581129&VOTE=22&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=588362&VOTE=411&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=588363&VOTE=412&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=589051&VOTE=380&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=589807&VOTE=451&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=592234&VOTE=576&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=592688&VOTE=595&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback