AL HB83 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Delivered to Governor at 3:48 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-04-01 - Delivered to Governor at 3:48 p.m. on April 1, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Penny Trust Fund (PTF), Comptroller authorized to transmit funds to State Board of Education, Secs. 41-15A-2, 41-15A-6 am'd
Title
Penny Trust Fund (PTF), Comptroller authorized to transmit funds to State Board of Education, Secs. 41-15A-2, 41-15A-6 am'd
Sponsors
Rep. Laura Hall [D] |
Roll Calls
2014-03-21 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2014-02-04 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:48 p.m. on April 1, 2014. |
2014-04-01 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-314. |
2014-04-01 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-04-01 | House | Enrolled |
2014-04-01 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1041 |
2014-03-20 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2014-02-04 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 145 |
2014-02-04 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-22 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |