AL HB82 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Assigned Act No. 2022-53.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on February 22 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-02-22 - Assigned Act No. 2022-53.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Small Business Relief and Revitalization Act of 2022, cancellation of indebtedness income exempt from income tax, financial institution excise tax and corporate income tax due date extension, certain business tangible personal property ad valorem tax exemption, deposit of certified funds with Revenue in lieu of one-time surety bond for licensure, average monthly sales tax liability for estimated payments increased, Secs. 40-16-3.1, 40-18-39.1 added; Secs. 40-9-1, 40-23-6, 40-23-6.1, 40-23-7 am'd.
Title
Small Business Relief and Revitalization Act of 2022, cancellation of indebtedness income exempt from income tax, financial institution excise tax and corporate income tax due date extension, certain business tangible personal property ad valorem tax exemption, deposit of certified funds with Revenue in lieu of one-time surety bond for licensure, average monthly sales tax liability for estimated payments increased, Secs. 40-16-3.1, 40-18-39.1 added; Secs. 40-9-1, 40-23-6, 40-23-6.1, 40-23-7 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 336 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - SBIR: Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 335 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 29 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 28 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - HBIR: Garrett motion to Adopt Roll Call 27 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2022-02-17 - Senate - SBIR: Gudger motion to Adopt Roll Call 335 (Y: 29 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 29 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - Motion to Adopt Roll Call 28 (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-02-03 - House - HBIR: Garrett motion to Adopt Roll Call 27 (Y: 99 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-22 | House | Assigned Act No. 2022-53. |
2022-02-22 | House | Delivered to Governor at 3:19 p.m. on February 22, 2022. |
2022-02-22 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2022-02-22 | House | Enrolled |
2022-02-22 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2022-02-22 | House | Passed Second House |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 336 |
2022-02-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education |
2022-02-03 | House | Engrossed |
2022-02-03 | House | Morris intended to vote "Yea" |
2022-02-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 29 |
2022-02-03 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 28 |
2022-02-03 | House | Ways and Means Education Amendment Offered |
2022-02-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2022-02-02 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment |
2022-01-11 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education |
Same As/Similar To
SB189 (Same As) 2022-02-17 - Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
40 | 16 | 3.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 18 | 39.1 | New Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 23 | 6 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 23 | 6.1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 23 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
40 | 9 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |