AL HB81 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Forwarded to Governor at 7:10 p.m. on March 18, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 18 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-18 - Forwarded to Governor at 7:10 p.m. on March 18, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Wetumpka, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, exceptions
Title
Wetumpka, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales, exceptions
Sponsors
Rep. Mike Holmes [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-03-18 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 21 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2015-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 44 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2015-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 44 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 7:10 p.m. on March 18, 2015. |
2015-03-18 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-7. |
2015-03-18 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-03-18 | House | Enrolled |
2015-03-18 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 137 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2015-03-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 40 |
2015-03-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-10 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |