AL HB81 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:16 a.m. on April 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-25 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:16 a.m. on April 25, 2013.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Cosmetology, Board of, Sunset Review Law, continued until October 1, 2017, with modification to further provide for the instructional credit hours for licensure, Sec. 34-7A-22 am'd.
Title
Cosmetology, Board of, Sunset Review Law, continued until October 1, 2017, with modification to further provide for the instructional credit hours for licensure, Sec. 34-7A-22 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 24 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-25 | House | Forwarded to Governor at 10:16 a.m. on April 25, 2013. |
2013-04-25 | House | Assigned Act No. 2013-164. |
2013-04-25 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2013-04-25 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2013-04-25 | House | Enrolled |
2013-04-25 | House | Passed Second House |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 556 |
2013-04-24 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth Affairs, and Human Resources |
2013-02-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 123 |
2013-02-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2013-02-06 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2013-02-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions |