AL HB801 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 1:40 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Wilcox Co., county commission, contingent fund, appropriation and expenditures authorized

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Wilcox Co., county commission, contingent fund, appropriation and expenditures authorized

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Delivered to Governor at 1:40 p.m. on April 22, 2010.
2010-04-22 Assigned Act No. 2010-738 on 04/30/2010.
2010-04-22 Enrolled
2010-04-22 Clerk of the House Certification
2010-04-22 Signature Requested
2010-04-22 Second House Concurs in Executive Amendment
2010-04-22 Sanders motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1183
2010-04-21 Thomas (J) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1112
2010-04-21 Executive Amendment Offered
2010-04-21 Forwarded to Governor
2010-04-22 House of Origin Concurs in Executive Amendment
2010-04-14 Clerk of the House Certification
2010-04-14 Signature Requested
2010-04-13 Enrolled
2010-04-13 Passed Second House
2010-04-13 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1017
2010-04-13 Third Reading Passed
2010-04-08 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-04-06 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2010-04-06 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 809
2010-04-06 Third Reading Passed
2010-04-01 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-03-30 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback