AL HB80 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Assigned Act No. 2018-39.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on January 25 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-01-25 - Assigned Act No. 2018-39.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Coosa Co., sheriff, booking fee, imposed on each person booked in co. jail, distribution of revenues
Title
Coosa Co., sheriff, booking fee, imposed on each person booked in co. jail, distribution of revenues
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-01-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 59 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
2018-01-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 0 NV: 59 Abs: 19) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-25 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-39. |
2018-01-25 | House | Forwarded to Governor on January 25, 2018 at 1:05 p.m. on January 25, 2018. |
2018-01-25 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-01-25 | House | Enrolled |
2018-01-25 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 109 |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-16 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2018-01-16 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 13 |
2018-01-16 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-11 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |