AL HB80 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on April 13, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 8 2010 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-13 - Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on April 13, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Energy, Alabama Public Interest Energy Research and Development Grants Program, established, funding for energy projects, Commission on Public Interest Energy Research and Development Grants, established, Permanent Joint Legislative Committee on Energy Policy to advise, Public Interest Energy Research and Development Grants Fund, established, appropriation
Title
Energy, Alabama Public Interest Energy Research and Development Grants Program, established, funding for energy projects, Commission on Public Interest Energy Research and Development Grants, established, Permanent Joint Legislative Committee on Energy Policy to advise, Public Interest Energy Research and Development Grants Fund, established, appropriation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-08 - House - Graham motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2010-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2010-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-04-08 - Senate - Motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2010-01-19 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 89 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 14) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-13 | Delivered to Governor at 1:35 p.m. on April 13, 2010. | |
2010-04-13 | Message from the Governor with Executive Amendment | |
2010-04-13 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-13 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-13 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2010-04-08 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-08 | Graham motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 901 | |
2010-04-08 | Concurrence Requested | |
2010-04-08 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 920 | |
2010-04-08 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 919 | |
2010-04-08 | Finance and Taxation General Fund Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-08 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-11 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2010-01-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund | |
2010-01-19 | Engrossed | |
2010-01-19 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 18 | |
2010-01-19 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 17 | |
2010-01-19 | Wren Amendment Offered | |
2010-01-19 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 16 | |
2010-01-19 | Government Appropriations first Substitute Offered | |
2010-01-19 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-01-14 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Government Appropriations |