AL HB8 | 2023 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2023-05-31 - Indefinitely Postpone
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Relating to motor vehicles; to amend Sections 32-5A-350, 32-5A-351, and 32-5A-352, Code of Alabama 1975, and to add Sections 32-5A-350.1 and 32-5A-353 to 32-5A-359, inclusive, to the Code of Alabama 1975, to provide prohibitions on the use of a wireless telecommunications device while operating a motor vehicle, with exceptions; to further provide criminal penalties; to provide exemptions; to distribute a portion of any fines collected to the Alabama Department of Economic and Community Affairs for the purchase of devices to enable substantially hands-free voice-based communications in a motor vehicle and to provide the devices to certain low-income families in the state; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to motor vehicles; to amend Sections 32-5A-350, 32-5A-351, and 32-5A-352, Code of Alabama 1975, and to add Sections 32-5A-350.1 and 32-5A-353 to 32-5A-359, inclusive, to the Code of Alabama 1975, to provide prohibitions on the use of a wireless telecommunications device while operating a motor vehicle, with exceptions; to further provide criminal penalties; to provide exemptions; to distribute a portion of any fines collected to the Alabama Department of Economic and Community Affairs for the purchase of devices to enable substantially hands-free voice-based communications in a motor vehicle and to provide the devices to certain low-income families in the state; and in connection therewith would have as its purpose or effect the requirement of a new or increased expenditure of local funds within the meaning of Section 111.05 of the Constitution of Alabama of 2022.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2023-04-04 - House - Carry Over to the Call of the Chair (Y: 56 N: 41 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Adopt (Y: 91 N: 4 NV: 6 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2023-04-04 - House - Adopt (Y: 56 N: 34 NV: 11 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2023-05-31HouseIndefinitely Postpone
2023-04-04HouseAmendment Withdrawn
2023-04-04HouseAdopt TUJH19-1
2023-04-04HouseAdopt CP2KWQ-1
2023-04-04HouseCarry Over to the Call of the Chair
2023-04-04HouseAMD/SUB IFG76W-1
2023-04-04HouseAMD/SUB 1G55LZ-1
2023-04-04HouseOn Third Reading in House of Origin
2023-03-22HouseRead Second Time in House of Origin
2023-03-22HouseReported Out of Committee in House of Origin
2023-03-22HouseReported Favorably from House Public Safety and Homeland Security
2023-03-22HouseAmendment/Substitute by House Public Safety and Homeland Security QCM214-1
2023-01-20HouseIntroduced and Referred to House Public Safety and Homeland Security
2023-01-20HousePrefiled

Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search
Texthttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/HB8-int.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/QCM214-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/CP2KWQ-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/TUJH19-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/IFG76W-1.pdf
Amendmenthttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/1G55LZ-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-PI1PGE-1.pdf
Supplementhttps://www.legislature.state.al.us/pdf/SearchableInstruments/2023RS/FiscalNotes/FN-PI1PGE-2.pdf
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc33
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc34
Roll Callhttps://alison.legislature.state.al.us/bill-search#rc35

Bill Comments

feedback