AL HB8 | 2015 | 2nd Special Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on September 16 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-09-16 - Delivered to Governor at 11:13 a.m. on September 16, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prescription drugs, privilege tax, supplemental tax, distrib., approval of increase by Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services (CMS)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prescription drugs, privilege tax, supplemental tax, distrib., approval of increase by Centers for Medicare and Medicaid Services (CMS)

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-09-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 53 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - House - Beech motion to Table (Y: 57 N: 26 NV: 1 Abs: 20) [PASS]
2015-09-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 63 N: 22 NV: 1 Abs: 18) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-09-16HouseDelivered to Governor at 11:13 a.m. on September 16, 2015.
2015-09-16HouseAssigned Act No. 2015-537.
2015-09-16HouseClerk of the House Certification
2015-09-16SenateSignature Requested
2015-09-15HouseEnrolled
2015-09-15HousePassed Second House
2015-09-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 53
2015-09-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2015-09-11SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-10SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund
2015-09-10HouseEngrossed
2015-09-10HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 3
2015-09-10HouseBeech motion to Table adopted Roll Call 2
2015-09-10HouseRogers Amendment Offered
2015-09-10HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1
2015-09-10HouseBeech Amendment Offered
2015-09-10HouseThird Reading Passed
2015-09-09HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2015-09-08HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback