AL HB799 | 2010 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 22 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-22 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Foley, corp. limits alt., temporary tax exemption on certain property under certain conditions (2010-20858)

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Foley, corp. limits alt., temporary tax exemption on certain property under certain conditions (2010-20858)

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2010-04-22 Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on April 22, 2010.
2010-04-22 Assigned Act No. 2010-737 on 04/03/2010.
2010-04-22 Clerk of the House Certification
2010-04-22 Signature Requested
2010-04-21 Enrolled
2010-04-21 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2010-04-21 McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1118
2010-04-21 Concurrence Requested
2010-04-21 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1143
2010-04-21 Third Reading Passed
2010-04-21 Pittman request to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair Granted.
2010-04-21 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1136
2010-04-21 Pittman Amendment Offered
2010-04-21 Third Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2010-04-13 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2010-04-06 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2010-04-06 Engrossed
2010-04-06 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 807
2010-04-06 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 806
2010-04-06 McMillan first Substitute Offered
2010-04-06 Baldwin County Legislation first Substitute Offered
2010-04-06 Third Reading Passed
2010-04-01 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2010-03-30 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback