AL HB79 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-21 - Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Crimes & offenses, provides that advertising access to sexual or labor servitude is a Class B felony
Title
Crimes & offenses, provides that advertising access to sexual or labor servitude is a Class B felony
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Pending Senate Judiciary |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-29 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 184 |
2024-02-29 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-22 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | House | Pending House Judiciary |
2024-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Judiciary |
2024-02-01 | House | Prefiled |