AL HB79 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-04-25 - Enacted
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Relating to the Board of Pharmacy; to amend Section 34-23-32 of the Code of Alabama 1975, requiring a manufacturer, bottler, packager, wholesale drug distributor, and other entities in the supply chain for pharmaceutical products to obtain an annual permit from the board; to require each permit holder to designate a representative of the permit holder who would be required to register with the board; and to provide for an additional annual registration fee.
Title
Relating to the Board of Pharmacy; to amend Section 34-23-32 of the Code of Alabama 1975, requiring a manufacturer, bottler, packager, wholesale drug distributor, and other entities in the supply chain for pharmaceutical products to obtain an annual permit from the board; to require each permit holder to designate a representative of the permit holder who would be required to register with the board; and to provide for an additional annual registration fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-04-25 - Senate - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Add Cosponsor (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 64) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Add Cosponsor (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 64) [PASS]
2023-04-11 - House - Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 104 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-25 | House | Enacted |
2023-04-25 | House | Enrolled |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Ready to Enroll |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-25 | Senate | On Third Reading in Second House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Read Second Time in Second House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee in Second House |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Reported Favorably from Senate State Governmental Affairs |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Referred to Committee to Senate State Governmental Affairs |
2023-04-11 | House | Read First Time in Second House |
2023-04-11 | House | Add Cosponsor |
2023-04-11 | House | Read a Third Time and Pass |
2023-04-11 | House | On Third Reading in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Read Second Time in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Out of Committee in House of Origin |
2023-03-22 | House | Reported Favorably from House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2023-03-07 | House | Introduced and Referred to House Boards, Agencies and Commissions |
2023-03-07 | House | Read First Time in House of Origin |