AL HB79 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 9 2021 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-22 - Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employees' Retirement System, State Police Tier II plan reopened to any employee of Alabama State Law Enforcement Agency who is certified by the Alabama Peace Officers' Standards and Training Commission and performs law enforcement duties, 25 year retirement and hazardous duty time allowed, Secs. 36-27-1, 36-27-16, 41-27-7 am'd.
Title
Employees' Retirement System, State Police Tier II plan reopened to any employee of Alabama State Law Enforcement Agency who is certified by the Alabama Peace Officers' Standards and Training Commission and performs law enforcement duties, 25 year retirement and hazardous duty time allowed, Secs. 36-27-1, 36-27-16, 41-27-7 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass Roll Call 31 (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - HBIR: Pettus motion to Adopt Roll Call 30 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2021-02-09 - House - HBIR: Pettus motion to Adopt Roll Call 30 (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-22 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 26 Favorable from Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2021-04-22 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-09 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund |
2021-02-09 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 31 |
2021-02-09 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2021-02-03 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2021-02-02 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means General Fund |
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
36 | 27 | 1 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
36 | 27 | 16 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
41 | 27 | 7 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |