AL HB79 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 5:44 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 31 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Delivered to Governor at 5:44 p.m. on May 31, 2019.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Child advocacy centers, requirements for membership in the Alabama Network of Children's Advocacy Centers, forensic interviews, Sec. 26-16-70 am'd.
Title
Child advocacy centers, requirements for membership in the Alabama Network of Children's Advocacy Centers, forensic interviews, Sec. 26-16-70 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-04-02 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-31 | House | Delivered to Governor at 5:44 p.m. on May 31, 2019. |
2019-05-31 | House | Assigned Act No. 2019-455. |
2019-05-31 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2019-05-31 | House | Enrolled |
2019-05-31 | House | Passed Second House |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1471 |
2019-05-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Children, Youth and Human Services |
2019-04-02 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 86 |
2019-04-02 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2019-03-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2019-03-05 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy |