AL HB776 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Delivered to Governor at 2:02 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Geneva County, sales tax, county commission authorized to levy additional tax, collect, distribution for jail construction, road and bridges, and resouces officers, referendum

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Geneva County, sales tax, county commission authorized to levy additional tax, collect, distribution for jail construction, road and bridges, and resouces officers, referendum

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-16 - House - Chesteen motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 15 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-11 - Senate - Holley motion to Adopt (Y: 19 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-05-08 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 0 NV: 57 Abs: 25) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Delivered to Governor at 2:02 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-541.
2012-05-16 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Concurred in Second House Amendment
2012-05-16 Chesteen motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1539
2012-05-16 Concurrence Requested
2012-05-10 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1365
2012-05-10 Holley motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1364
2012-05-10 Holley Amendment Offered
2012-05-10 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-09 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-08 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2012-05-08 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1301
2012-05-08 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-03 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-02 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB776
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB776-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB776-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=445602&VOTE=1301&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448967&VOTE=1364&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=448968&VOTE=1365&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=449631&VOTE=1539&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback