AL HB77 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 25 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-30 - Delivered to Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Newborn Screening Panel, procedure for addition of conditions to panel, further provided for
Title
Newborn Screening Panel, procedure for addition of conditions to panel, further provided for
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-25 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Roll Call 721 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt - Roll Call 720 E4UL299-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Melson motion to Adopt - Roll Call 720 E4UL299-1 (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-04-25 - Senate - Third Reading in Second House (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Passed House Of Origin (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-02-22 - House - Third Reading House of Origin (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-30 | House | Delivered to Governor |
2024-04-30 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2024-04-25 | House | Enrolled |
2024-04-25 | House | Ready to Enroll |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass as Amended - Adopted Roll Call 721 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Melson motion to Adopt - Adopted Roll Call 720 E4UL299-1 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Melson 1st Amendment Offered E4UL299-1 |
2024-04-25 | Senate | Third Reading in Second House |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Reported Out of Committee Second House |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Pending Senate Healthcare |
2024-02-27 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate Committee on Healthcare |
2024-02-22 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass - Adopted Roll Call 100 |
2024-02-22 | House | Third Reading in House of Origin |
2024-02-21 | House | Read for the Second Time and placed on the Calendar |
2024-02-21 | House | Reported Out of Committee House of Origin |
2024-02-06 | House | Pending House Health |
2024-02-06 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House Committee on Health |
2024-02-01 | House | Prefiled |