AL HB77 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-05-31 - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1454
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Retirement, RSA, retirement plans, Tier III retirement plan created, Tier III Teacher Recruitment and Retention Act, plan benefits defined, Secs. 16-25-1, 16-25-11.1, 16-25-14, 16-25-21 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Retirement, RSA, retirement plans, Tier III retirement plan created, Tier III Teacher Recruitment and Retention Act, plan benefits defined, Secs. 16-25-1, 16-25-11.1, 16-25-14, 16-25-21 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-31 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-05-31 - Senate - Chesteen motion to Adopt (Y: 29 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2019-04-25 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-31SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1454
2019-05-31SenateChesteen motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1453
2019-05-31SenateMarsh Amendment Offered
2019-05-31SenateThird Reading Passed
2019-05-28SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2019-05-02SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation Education
2019-04-25HouseEngrossed
2019-04-25HouseGreer intended "not to vote"
2019-04-25HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 377
2019-04-25HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 376
2019-04-25HouseWays and Means Education first Substitute Offered
2019-04-25HouseThird Reading Passed
2019-04-18HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2019-03-05HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Ways and Means Education

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB77&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB77-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/HB77-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/198480-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2019RS/PrintFiles/202376-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=613263&VOTE=376&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=613264&VOTE=377&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627702&VOTE=1453&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=627705&VOTE=1454&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1074&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback