AL HB77 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 6 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-06 - Enrolled
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Childersburg, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales by retail licensees, city council authorized to regulate and permit, referendum
Title
Childersburg, alcoholic beverages, Sunday sales by retail licensees, city council authorized to regulate and permit, referendum
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-01 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 22 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2018-01-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 76 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
2018-01-23 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 16 N: 0 NV: 76 Abs: 10) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-06 | House | Assigned Act No. 2018-193. |
2018-03-06 | House | Delivered to Governor at 2:38 p.m. on March 6, 2018. |
2018-03-06 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2018-03-06 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2018-03-01 | House | Enrolled |
2018-03-01 | House | Passed Second House |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 545 |
2018-03-01 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2018-02-13 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-25 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation |
2018-01-23 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 63 |
2018-01-23 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2018-01-18 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2018-01-09 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Local Legislation |