AL HB77 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Delivered to Governor at 7:29 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Local Government Training Institute, bd. of director, two add'l members appointed by Assoc. of Co. Commissions, quorum, expanded to include certification of co. employees and programs, Sec. 11-3-45 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Local Government Training Institute, bd. of director, two add'l members appointed by Assoc. of Co. Commissions, quorum, expanded to include certification of co. employees and programs, Sec. 11-3-45 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-04-20 - House - Davis motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 2 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 85 N: 11 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 81 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 22) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-19HouseDelivered to Governor at 7:29 p.m. on May 19, 2017.
2017-05-19HouseAssigned Act No. 2017-440.
2017-05-19HouseClerk of the House Certification
2017-05-19SenateSignature Requested
2017-05-19HouseEnrolled
2017-05-19HousePassed Second House
2017-05-19SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1328
2017-05-19SenateThird Reading Passed
2017-05-17SenateWhatley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-05-17SenateWhatley motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2017-05-17SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2017-03-14SenateReported from Governmental Affairs as Favorable
2017-03-09SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs
2017-03-09HouseEngrossed
2017-03-09HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 194
2017-03-09HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 193
2017-03-09HouseBoards, Agencies and Commissions Amendment Offered
2017-03-09HouseThird Reading Passed
2017-02-16HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2017-02-07HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards, Agencies and Commissions

Subjects


Alabama State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback