AL HB76 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 15 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-15 - Forwarded to Governor at 12:09 p.m. on March 15, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Child care facilities, daycare centers defined to include preschools, church based, licensing required under certain conditions, criminal history background checks required, Sec. 38-7-21 added; Secs. 13A-6-29, 38-7-2, 38-7-3, 38-13-2, 38-13-3 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Child care facilities, daycare centers defined to include preschools, church based, licensing required under certain conditions, criminal history background checks required, Sec. 38-7-21 added; Secs. 13A-6-29, 38-7-2, 38-7-3, 38-13-2, 38-13-3 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-15 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 23 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 86 N: 5 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 50 N: 37 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - House - Warren motion to Table (Y: 31 N: 35 NV: 1 Abs: 35) [FAIL]
2018-02-01 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 83 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 15) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-15HouseForwarded to Governor at 12:09 p.m. on March 15, 2018.
2018-03-15HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-278.
2018-03-15HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-15SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-15HouseEnrolled
2018-03-15HousePassed Second House
2018-03-15SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 829
2018-03-15SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-13SenateDial motion to Carry Over to the Call of the Chair adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-13SenateThird Reading Carried Over to Call of the Chair
2018-03-08SenateDial motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote
2018-03-08SenateThird Reading Carried Over
2018-02-22SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar
2018-02-06SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2018-02-01HouseEngrossed
2018-02-01HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 173
2018-02-01HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 172
2018-02-01HouseWarren motion to Table lost Roll Call 171
2018-02-01HouseFarley Amendment Offered
2018-02-01HouseFarley motion to withdraw his amendment adopted Voice Vote
2018-02-01HouseFarley Amendment Offered
2018-02-01HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 170
2018-02-01HouseChildren and Senior Advocacy first Substitute Offered
2018-02-01HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-01-30HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Children and Senior Advocacy

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB76&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB76-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB76-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190627-2.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/190627-4.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/191022-1.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=585531&VOTE=170&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=585581&VOTE=171&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=585582&VOTE=172&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=585584&VOTE=173&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=596341&VOTE=829&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback