AL HB76 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Forwarded to Governor at 6:50 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 2 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-02 - Forwarded to Governor at 6:50 p.m. on June 2, 2011.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Surplus Lines Insurance Multi-State Compliance Compact Commission, established, Surplus Lines Insurance Multi-State Compliance Compact Act
Title
Surplus Lines Insurance Multi-State Compliance Compact Commission, established, Surplus Lines Insurance Multi-State Compliance Compact Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-06-02 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2011-05-05 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-02 | Forwarded to Governor at 6:50 p.m. on June 2, 2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Assigned Act No. 2011-537 on 06/09/2011. | |
2011-06-02 | Signature Requested | |
2011-06-02 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2011-06-02 | Enrolled | |
2011-06-02 | Passed Second House | |
2011-06-02 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 977 | |
2011-06-02 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-05-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-05-24 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance | |
2011-05-05 | Engrossed | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 714 | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 713 | |
2011-05-05 | Wren 2nd Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 712 | |
2011-05-05 | Wren 1st Amendment Offered | |
2011-05-05 | Third Reading Passed | |
2011-04-06 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2011-03-01 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Insurance |