AL HB75 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 3 2020 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminal prosecutions, update outdated language in provision pertaining to video depositions in child abuse prosecutions, Sec. 15-25-2 am'd.
Title
Criminal prosecutions, update outdated language in provision pertaining to video depositions in child abuse prosecutions, Sec. 15-25-2 am'd.
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 101 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Pending third reading on day 13 Favorable from Judiciary |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-03-03 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 175 |
2020-03-03 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2020-02-20 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2020-02-04 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary |