AL HB75 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 4:05 p.m. on April 14, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Delivered to Governor at 4:05 p.m. on April 14, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Surface Mining Commission, meeting days altered, fees, licenses and renewals, contracts with attorneys as hearing officers authorized, requirement for citations compelling attendance at hearings deleted if cessation order issued, Secs. 9-16-73, 9-16-74, 9-16-77, 9-16-78, 9-16-81, 9-16-93 am'd.
Title
Surface Mining Commission, meeting days altered, fees, licenses and renewals, contracts with attorneys as hearing officers authorized, requirement for citations compelling attendance at hearings deleted if cessation order issued, Secs. 9-16-73, 9-16-74, 9-16-77, 9-16-78, 9-16-81, 9-16-93 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-14 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2010-03-11 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 98 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Delivered to Governor at 4:05 p.m. on April 14, 2010. | |
2010-04-14 | Assigned Act No. 2010-498. | |
2010-04-14 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-14 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-14 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-14 | Passed Second House | |
2010-04-14 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1072 | |
2010-04-14 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-03-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Governmental Affairs | |
2010-03-11 | Engrossed | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 602 | |
2010-03-11 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 601 | |
2010-03-11 | Boards and Commissions first Substitute Offered | |
2010-03-11 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-02-17 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-01-12 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Boards and Commissions |