AL HB748 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Assigned Act No. 2012-488.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Baldwin County, sales tax levied, distribution of proceeds to Board of Education, const. amend.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Baldwin County, sales tax levied, distribution of proceeds to Board of Education, const. amend.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2012-05-17 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-05-09 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 52 Abs: 21) [FAIL]
2012-05-09 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 21 Abs: 19) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2012-05-16 Assigned Act No. 2012-488.
2012-05-16 Delivered to Secretary of State on May 16, 2012 at 6:40 p. m.
2012-05-16 Clerk of the House Certification
2012-05-16 Enrolled
2012-05-16 Signature Requested
2012-05-16 Passed Second House
2012-05-16 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1426
2012-05-16 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-10 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar
2012-05-09 Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1
2012-05-09 Engrossed
2012-05-09 Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1394
2012-05-09 Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1393
2012-05-09 Davis Substitute to Substitute Offered
2012-05-09 Baldwin County Legislation first Substitute Offered
2012-05-09 Third Reading Passed
2012-05-02 Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2012-04-24 Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/SESSBillResult.ASPX?WIN_TYPE=BillResult&BILL=HB748
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB748-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB748-eng.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2012RS/PrintFiles/HB748-enr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=447124&VOTE=1394&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=447196&VOTE=1393&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=449916&VOTE=1426&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1059&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback