AL HB74 | 2018 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 28 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-28 - Delivered to Governor at 6:10 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

Juvenile courts, credit for time spent incarcerated pending adjudication provided for, Sec. 15-18-5 am'd.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile courts, credit for time spent incarcerated pending adjudication provided for, Sec. 15-18-5 am'd.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-03-28 - House - Hollis motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-27 - Senate - Coleman-Madison motion to Adopt (Y: 25 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2018-03-15 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 7) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-03-28HouseDelivered to Governor at 6:10 p.m. on March 28, 2018.
2018-03-28HouseAssigned Act No. 2018-525.
2018-03-28HouseClerk of the House Certification
2018-03-28SenateSignature Requested
2018-03-28HouseEnrolled
2018-03-28SenateConcurred in Second House Amendment
2018-03-28HouseHollis motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1089
2018-03-28HouseConcurrence Requested
2018-03-27SenateMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1189
2018-03-27SenateColeman-Madison motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1188
2018-03-27SenateJudiciary first Substitute Offered
2018-03-27SenateThird Reading Passed
2018-03-21SenateRead for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and
2018-03-20SenateRead for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Judiciary
2018-03-15HouseEngrossed
2018-03-15HouseMotion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 844
2018-03-15HouseMotion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 843
2018-03-15HouseJudiciary Amendment Offered
2018-03-15HouseThird Reading Passed
2018-03-01HouseRead for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment
2018-01-09HouseRead for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Judiciary

Subjects


Alabama State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/Alison/SESSBillStatusResult.aspx?BILL=HB74&WIN_TYPE=SELECTED_STATUS
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB74-int.pdf
Texthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/HB74-eng.pdf
Amendmenthttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/ALISON/SearchableInstruments/2018RS/PrintFiles/192201-2.pdf
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597212&VOTE=843&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=597215&VOTE=844&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=601548&VOTE=1188&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=601549&VOTE=1189&BODY=S&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 
Roll Callhttp://alisondb.legislature.state.al.us/alison/GetRollCallVoteResults.aspx?MOID=602234&VOTE=1089&BODY=H&INST=&SESS=1070&AMDSUB= 

Bill Comments

feedback