AL HB74 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Delivered to Governor at 4:33 p.m. on March 5, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 5 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-03-05 - Delivered to Governor at 4:33 p.m. on March 5, 2014.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Faulkner University, police officers, appointment, Sec. 16-22-1 am'd.
Title
Faulkner University, police officers, appointment, Sec. 16-22-1 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2014-02-11 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-05 | House | Delivered to Governor at 4:33 p.m. on March 5, 2014. |
2014-03-05 | House | Assigned Act No. 2014-156. |
2014-03-05 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2014-03-05 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2014-03-04 | House | Enrolled |
2014-03-04 | House | Passed Second House |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 649 |
2014-03-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2014-02-20 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-02-11 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education |
2014-02-11 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 202 |
2014-02-11 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2014-01-15 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2014-01-14 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Public Safety and Homeland Security |