AL HB739 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on April 21 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-21 - Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on April 22, 2010.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Baldwin Co., planning and zoning commission and board of adjustment, members, jurisdiction, members with real estate licenses and setbacks for wetlands further provided for, appeals, procedure for the implementation of planning and zoning and for certain conflicts, Secs. 45-2-261.01, 45-2-261.02, 45-2-261.07, 45-2-261.10, 45-2-261.13, 45-2-261.17, 45-2-261.40 am'd. (2010-20821)
Title
Baldwin Co., planning and zoning commission and board of adjustment, members, jurisdiction, members with real estate licenses and setbacks for wetlands further provided for, appeals, procedure for the implementation of planning and zoning and for certain conflicts, Secs. 45-2-261.01, 45-2-261.02, 45-2-261.07, 45-2-261.10, 45-2-261.13, 45-2-261.17, 45-2-261.40 am'd. (2010-20821)
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] | Rep. Randy Davis [R] | Rep. Joe Faust [R] | Rep. Steve McMillan [R] |
Rep. Harry Shiver [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-21 | Delivered to Governor at 10:30 a.m. on April 22, 2010. | |
2010-04-21 | Assigned Act No. 2010-719. | |
2010-04-21 | McMillan motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1121 | |
2010-04-22 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2010-04-21 | Concurrence Requested | |
2010-04-21 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1160 | |
2010-04-22 | Signature Requested | |
2010-04-21 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1159 | |
2010-04-22 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2010-04-21 | Enrolled | |
2010-04-21 | Pittman Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-21 | Pittman motion to Reconsider adopted Voice Vote | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-21 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1134 | |
2010-04-21 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-04-13 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2010-04-06 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Local Legislation No. 1 | |
2010-04-01 | Engrossed | |
2010-04-01 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 740 | |
2010-04-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 739 | |
2010-04-01 | McMillan Amendment Offered | |
2010-04-01 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 738 | |
2010-04-01 | Baldwin County Legislation first Substitute Offered | |
2010-04-01 | Third Reading Passed | |
2010-03-30 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar with 1 substitute and | |
2010-03-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Baldwin County Legislation |