AL HB733 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on May 16 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-16 - Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p. m. on May 16, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Commercial development authorities, formation, requirement that incorporator be a natural person or qualified elector remove; Secs. 11-54-171, 11-54-173, 11-54-174, 11-54-178, 11-54-190 am'd
Title
Commercial development authorities, formation, requirement that incorporator be a natural person or qualified elector remove; Secs. 11-54-171, 11-54-173, 11-54-174, 11-54-178, 11-54-190 am'd
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Baker [R] | Rep. Alan Harper [R] | Rep. Thomas Jackson [D] | Rep. Mike Jones [R] |
Rep. Barry Mask [R] | Rep. Harry Shiver [R] |
Roll Calls
2012-05-19 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
2012-05-03 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 13) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-16 | Forwarded to Governor at 10:40 p. m. on May 16, 2012. | |
2012-05-16 | Assigned Act No. 2012-538. | |
2012-05-16 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-16 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-16 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-16 | Passed Second House | |
2012-05-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1475 | |
2012-05-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-05-09 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-05-03 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Finance and Taxation General Fund | |
2012-05-03 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1204 | |
2012-05-03 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-04-26 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar | |
2012-04-19 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |