AL HB72 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Assigned Act No. 2015-1.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-03-12 - Assigned Act No. 2015-1.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Alcoholic beverages, municipal option elections held under Section 28-2A-1, Code of Alabama 1975, as amended by Act 2009-546, taxes, licenses, ratified and confirmed
Title
Alcoholic beverages, municipal option elections held under Section 28-2A-1, Code of Alabama 1975, as amended by Act 2009-546, taxes, licenses, ratified and confirmed
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-12 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 93) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Cosponsors Added (Y: 7 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 93) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 93 N: 2 NV: 4 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2015-03-10 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 96 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-12 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-1. |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Reported from County and Municipal Government as Favorable |
2015-03-12 | House | Delivered to Governor on March 12, 2015 at 12:01 p.m. |
2015-03-12 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-03-12 | House | Enrolled |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-03-12 | House | Passed Second House |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 50 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-10 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on County and Municipal Government |
2015-03-10 | House | Engrossed |
2015-03-10 | House | Cosponsors Added |
2015-03-10 | House | Ainsworth intended to vote "Yea" |
2015-03-10 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 27 |
2015-03-10 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-03-10 | House | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 26 |
2015-03-10 | House | Standridge Amendment Offered |
2015-03-05 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Economic Development and Tourism |