AL HB72 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:40 p. m. on May 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-01 - Forwarded to Governor at 3:40 p. m. on May 1, 2012.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment compensation, fraudulent misrepresentation claims, 52-week disqualification until overpayment paid in cash, federal and state income intercepts used to satisfy overpayment deemed cash payments, interest on unpaid overpayment balances, Sec. 25-4-145 am'd.
Title
Unemployment compensation, fraudulent misrepresentation claims, 52-week disqualification until overpayment paid in cash, federal and state income intercepts used to satisfy overpayment deemed cash payments, interest on unpaid overpayment balances, Sec. 25-4-145 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-05-01 - House - DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 88 N: 2 NV: 1 Abs: 14) [PASS]
2012-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-29 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 77 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
2012-04-29 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-04-29 - Senate - Bussman motion to Adopt (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 78 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
2012-02-16 - House - Motion to Adopt (Y: 77 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 23) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-01 | Forwarded to Governor at 3:40 p. m. on May 1, 2012. | |
2012-05-01 | Assigned Act No. 2012-292. | |
2012-05-01 | Clerk of the House Certification | |
2012-05-01 | Signature Requested | |
2012-05-01 | Enrolled | |
2012-05-01 | Concurred in Second House Amendment | |
2012-05-01 | DeMarco motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1069 | |
2012-05-01 | Concurrence Requested | |
2012-04-26 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 831 | |
2012-04-26 | Bussman motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 830 | |
2012-04-26 | Banking and Insurance Amendment Offered | |
2012-04-26 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-23 | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Banking and Insurance | |
2012-02-16 | Engrossed | |
2012-02-16 | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 45 | |
2012-02-16 | Motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 44 | |
2012-02-16 | State Government Amendment Offered | |
2012-02-16 | Third Reading Passed | |
2012-02-08 | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar 1 amendment | |
2012-02-07 | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on State Government |