AL HB71 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 6:55 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 4 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-04 - Delivered to Governor at 6:55 p.m. on June 4, 2015.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Unemployment compensation, certain employees may not receive unemployment benefits, Sec. 25-4-70 am'd.
Title
Unemployment compensation, certain employees may not receive unemployment benefits, Sec. 25-4-70 am'd.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-06-04 - House - Williams (P) motion to Concur In and Adopt (Y: 99 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2015-06-04 - Senate - Holtzclaw motion to Adopt (Y: 26 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2015-05-26 - House - Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass (Y: 100 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-04 | House | Delivered to Governor at 6:55 p.m. on June 4, 2015. |
2015-06-04 | House | Assigned Act No. 2015-453. |
2015-06-04 | House | Clerk of the House Certification |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Signature Requested |
2015-06-04 | House | Enrolled |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Concurred in Second House Amendment |
2015-06-04 | House | Williams (P) motion to Concur In and Adopt adopted Roll Call 1342 |
2015-06-04 | House | Concurrence Requested |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1516 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to Adopt adopted Roll Call 1515 |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Holtzclaw Amendment Offered |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Holtzclaw motion to Carry Over adopted Voice Vote |
2015-06-04 | Senate | Third Reading Carried Over |
2015-06-03 | Senate | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-05-28 | Senate | Read for the first time and referred to the Senate committee on Education and Youth Affairs |
2015-05-26 | House | Motion to Read a Third Time and Pass adopted Roll Call 1109 |
2015-05-26 | House | Third Reading Passed |
2015-04-16 | House | Read for the second time and placed on the calendar |
2015-03-03 | House | Read for the first time and referred to the House of Representatives committee on Education Policy |